Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Harford County - Charitable Gaming
Sponsored by
Harford County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Creating in Harford County a permit to be issued by the Sheriff of Harford County that authorizes specified nonprofit organizations to conduct a gaming contest, an event that involves a card game, a dice game, or roulette; limiting to four the number of gaming contests an organization may hold in a calendar year; stating the location and hours for conducting a gaming contest; requiring participants in a gaming contest to use tokens and not cash for wagering under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Rules
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0195 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {655562/3 Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
62
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2015 2/05/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/09/2015 4/10/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Favorable with Amendments {655562/3 Report Adopted 65
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/10/2015 4/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 66
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 First Reading Senate Rules 62
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-1512 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM