Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Frederick County - Failure to Obey Traffic Control Device on Maryland Route 75 - Penalty
Sponsored by
Delegate Afzali
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing to $10,000 the maximum penalty for failure to obey a traffic control device governing the height of vehicles traveling on Maryland Route 75 between Baldwin Road and Maryland Route 80 in Frederick County.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0885
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2016 1/27/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/22/2016 2/22/2016 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2016 3/14/2016 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-167, 21-201, 27-105.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM