Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Frederick County - Gaming Permits
Sponsored by
Frederick County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 97
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing to four the number of gaming events that a specified organization in Frederick County may hold in a calendar year in which the major prize has a value of more than $5,000.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0615
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2014
Legislative Date
4/08/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 97
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2014 1/22/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/23/2014 1/23/2014 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2014 3/14/2014 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 47
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Second Reading Passed 47
House 3/17/2014 3/13/2014 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 49
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 56
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Second Reading Passed 56
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 57
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 4/08/2014 4/08/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 97
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-1304 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM