Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Personnel – Grievance Procedures
Sponsored by
Delegates Haynes, B. Barnes, Chang, Gutierrez, Hettleman, Jackson, Jones, Korman, Lam, Lierman, Reznik, Sophocleus, and Valentino-Smith
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Expanding the application of provisions of law governing grievance procedures for certain State employees; requiring a grievant to complete certain forms in sufficient detail that will allow for the expeditious resolution of the grievance; and applying a certain definition of "grievance" to a certain requirement that the Department of Transportation adopt certain regulations relating to employee grievance procedures.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0338
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0491 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Personnel - Grievance Procedures - Exclusive Representatives
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {434960/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Parrott) Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {913929/1 (Delegate Parrott) Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Personnel – Grievance Procedures
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (116-21)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {877377/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-13)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-45)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - State Personnel – Grievance Procedures
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2018
Legislative Date
5/25/2018
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Personnel - Grievance Procedures - Exclusive Representatives
House 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Favorable with Amendments {434960/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Parrott) Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Floor Amendment {913929/1 (Delegate Parrott) Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Personnel – Grievance Procedures
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Third Reading Passed (116-21) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments {877377/1 Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (32-13) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (94-45) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Personnel – Grievance Procedures
Post Passage 5/25/2018 5/25/2018 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
(   12-101, 12-102, 12-108 )
(   2-103.4 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page