Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Sentencing Review and Parole Eligibility - Juvenile Offenders Sentenced as Adults
Sponsored by
Delegates Carter, Morales, Anderson, Brooks, Dumais, Hornberger, Jalisi, Moon, Rosenberg, Smith, Stein, Sydnor, Tarlau, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing parole eligibility for a person sentenced for an offense committed before the person's 18th birthday under specified circumstances; authorizing a parole rehearing date no later than every 3 years for an inmate not granted parole after becoming eligible; authorizing representation of counsel for a specified person under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0366
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2015 2/05/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/05/2015 2/05/2015 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-301, 7-305, 7-310 )
(   6-234, 8-102, 8-105 )
(   14-104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM