Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Opioids - Distribution Causing Death of Minor
Sponsored by
Delegates Reilly, Arikan, Buckel, Hornberger, Rose, and Shoemaker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the distribution of a certain opioid or opioid analogue, the use of which causes the death of a minor; establishing a penalty of up to 30 years imprisonment for a violation of the Act; clarifying that certain conduct constitutes distribution under the Act; providing that certain conduct does not establish a defense under the Act; providing a certain defense under the Act; providing immunity for certain conduct under the Act; providing that a sentence imposed under the Act shall be consecutive to a certain other sentence; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0649 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Opioids - Distribution Causing Death of Minor
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Law - Opioids - Distribution Causing Death of Minor
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-402, 5-403, 5-602.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM