Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Regulation - Automated Purchasing Machines - Licensing of Operators and Required Records
Sponsored by
Delegate Clippinger
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a person to have an automated purchasing machine (APM) license before doing business as an APM operator; establishing the application process for an APM operator license; requiring applicants for an APM operator license and specified employees of an applicant or licensee to apply for a national and State criminal history check; providing for circumstances in which the Secretary can deny, reprimand, suspend, or revoke a license; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2014 1/22/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/23/2014 1/23/2014 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2014 3/15/2014 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-101 through 20-403 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM