Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Seeking Medical Assistance for Another Who Ingested Alcohol or Drugs - Minors
Sponsored by
Delegates Haddaway-Riccio and Eckardt
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a minor who, in good faith, seeks medical assistance for another person who is experiencing a medical emergency after ingesting alcohol or drugs may not be charged with or prosecuted for drug possession or underage possession of alcohol, be detained on an outstanding warrant for another nonviolent crime under specified circumstances, or be required to provide any personal identifying information for any purpose other than assisting in the medical treatment of the person experiencing a medical emergency; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0476
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2014 1/22/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/21/2014 2/24/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM