Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Historical Trust - Review of Capital Projects - Duties of Director
Sponsored by
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee (By Request - Departmental - Planning)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 98
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying the duties of the Director of the Maryland Historical Trust with respect to the review of specified capital projects; and clarifying the applicability of specified review requirements to specified categories of capital projects.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/17/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2014
Legislative Date
2/20/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/21/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2014
Legislative Date
4/08/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 98
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2014 1/22/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2014 2/17/2014 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 30
House 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Second Reading Passed 30
House 2/20/2014 2/20/2014 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 32
Senate 2/21/2014 2/21/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation 31
Senate 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/18/2014 3/19/2014 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/19/2014 3/14/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 48
Senate 3/19/2014 3/14/2014 Second Reading Passed 48
Senate 3/20/2014 3/15/2014 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 49
House 3/21/2014 3/18/2014 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 4/08/2014 4/08/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 98
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM