Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Driving Without a License or While License is Suspended - Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegates Carter, Dumais, Glass, Moon, Sanchez, and Smith
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the maximum penalty for driving a motor vehicle while a person's license or privilege to drive is suspended under specified provisions of State law; altering the maximum penalty for driving a motor vehicle while a person's license or privilege to drive is suspended by another state under specified circumstances; and altering the maximum penalty for driving on a highway without a license.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1130 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2016 1/27/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/31/2016 3/31/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   27-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM