Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Care Practitioners - Use of Teletherapy
Sponsored by
Delegates Reznik, Dumais, C. Howard, Krebs, Jackson, Pendergrass, Bromwell, Angel, Barron, Cullison, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, Kipke, McDonough, Metzgar, Miele, Morales, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, West, and K. Young
Status
Veto sustained (0-140)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing specified health care practitioners to use teletherapy for a specified patient under specified circumstances; and requiring specified health occupations boards to adopt specified regulations on or before April 1, 2018, that, to the extent practicable, are uniform and nonclinical.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1106
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017, October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Care Practitioners - Use of Teletherapy
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {876084/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Health Care Practitioners - Use of Teletherapy
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {634230/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {553928/1 (Senator Zucker) Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Sample-Hughes, K. Young and Miele)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Sample-Hughes, K. Young and Miele)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Zucker, Salling and Nathan-Pulliam)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Zucker, Salling and Nathan-Pulliam)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Conference Committee Report {213722/1 Adopted
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Conference Committee Report {213722/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Health Care Practitioners - Use of Teletherapy
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2017
Legislative Date
5/26/2017
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
Veto sustained (0-140)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Care Practitioners - Use of Teletherapy
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Favorable with Amendments {876084/1 Adopted 45
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Health Care Practitioners - Use of Teletherapy
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 46
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 45
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable with Amendments {634230/1 Adopted 58
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Floor Amendment {553928/1 (Senator Zucker) Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 59
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 65
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 House Requests Senate Recede 65
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Sample-Hughes, K. Young and Miele) 65
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 House Requests Senate Recede 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Sample-Hughes, K. Young and Miele) 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Senate Refuses Recede 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Zucker, Salling and Nathan-Pulliam) 62
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Senate Refuses Recede 68
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Zucker, Salling and Nathan-Pulliam) 68
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Conference Committee Report {213722/1 Adopted 69
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 69
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Conference Committee Report {213722/1 Adopted 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63A
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Health Care Practitioners - Use of Teletherapy
Post Passage 5/26/2017 5/26/2017 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 Veto sustained (0-140)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-901 through 1-903 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM