Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Reorganization of State Procurement
Sponsored by
Delegates Reznik, Angel, Bromwell, Hammen, Korman, Morhaim, Pena-Melnyk, and Proctor
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Reorganizing State procurement by establishing a Chief Procurement Officer to control and oversee all State procurement activity for which specified provisions of law apply; repealing the definition and role of primary procurement units; authorizing the Board of Public Works to require Board approval for procurement actions of $500,000 or more; requiring the Chief Procurement Officer to retain oversight of specified procurements that are conducted under specified authority or do not require specified Board approval; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016, October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2016 1/27/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-101, 12-101, 12-102, 12-105, 12-107, 12-108, 12-110, 12-301, 13-101, 13-102.1, 13-109, 13-110, 13-111, 13-204, 13-217, 13-218, 13-225, 13-226, 15-111, 15-216, 15-217, 4-801, 4-804 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM