Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - AIDS Prevention Sterile Needle and Syringe Exchange Program
Sponsored by
Delegate Anderson (By Request - Baltimore City Administration) and Delegates Clippinger, Glenn, Haynes, McHale, McIntosh, Mitchell, Oaks, B. Robinson, Stukes, Tarrant, and M. Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing a requirement that the AIDS Prevention Sterile Needle and Syringe Exchange Pilot Program in Baltimore City provide for the exchange of used hypodermic needles and syringes for sterile hypodermic needles and syringes on a "one-for-one" basis; altering a requirement that the Program's oversight committee provide advice to the Commissioner of Health and the Program Director on developing Program operating procedures for the exchange of hypodermic needles and syringes in a specified manner; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0263
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {436684/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Motion vote previous question (Delegate McHale) Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (84-51)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
41A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-6)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2014 1/22/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/28/2014 3/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Favorable with Amendments {436684/1 Report Adopted 41
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
House 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Motion vote previous question (Delegate McHale) Adopted 43
House 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Third Reading Passed (84-51) 43
Senate 3/10/2014 3/07/2014 First Reading Finance 41A
Senate 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/27/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 55
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Third Reading Passed (41-6) 56
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   24-802, 24-804, 24-805, 24-806 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM