Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Stationary Engineers - Qualifications for Stationary Engineer's Examination - Grade 1 and Grade 2
Sponsored by
Chair, Economic Matters Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor, Licensing and Regulation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Correcting the qualifications for the Grade 1 and Grade 2 stationary engineer's examinations to reference a licensed master restricted heating, ventilation, air-conditioning, or refrigeration contractor.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-2)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2013
Legislative Date
4/09/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2013 1/25/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/25/2013 1/25/2013 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/25/2013 2/26/2013 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 36
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Second Reading Passed 36
House 3/01/2013 3/01/2013 Third Reading Passed (134-2) 38
Senate 3/04/2013 3/04/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 37
Senate 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/29/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/09/2013 4/09/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM