Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Mental Injury
Sponsored by
Delegates Angel, Anderson, Bromwell, Carr, Davis, Dumais, Gutierrez, Hettleman, Hill, C. Howard, Korman, Lierman, Luedtke, Malone, McCray, McIntosh, Moon, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Queen, Sydnor, M. Washington, C. Wilson, and R. Lewis
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "mental injury" for the purpose of specified child abuse and neglect statutes to include the observable, identifiable, and substantial impairment of a child's mental or psychological ability to function that results from the child's exposure to an act that constitute a crime of violence, under specified provisions of law, committed by a parent or household or family member against a parent or household or family member.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {912312/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Mental Injury
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Child Neglect - Reporting - Commission of Crime of Violence in Presence of Minor
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments {912312/1 Adopted 65
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
Text - Third - Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Mental Injury
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 66
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Referred Rules 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-701 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM