Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Part-Time School Employees, Contractors, and Coaches - Sexual Contact With Minors Prohibited
Sponsored by
Delegates Arora and Simmons
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of a "person in a position of authority" prohibited from engaging in a sexual act, sexual contact, or vaginal intercourse with a specified person under a specified age under specified circumstances to include any employee, contractor, subcontractor, or contractor's employee, including a part-time employee or coach of a specified age who exercises supervision of the person.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0014 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2014 1/23/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/23/2014 1/23/2014 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/28/2014 3/03/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-307, 3-308 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM