Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Maryland Behavioral Health Crisis Response System
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Bromwell, Carr, Carter, Cullison, Hill, Kelly, Reznik, and Sample-Hughes
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 416
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the name of the Maryland Mental Health Crisis Response System to be the Maryland Behavioral Health Crisis Response System; requiring the Crisis Response System to evaluate the outcomes of services through the annual collection of data on behavioral health calls received by police, attempted and completed suicides, unnecessary hospitalizations, hospital diversions, arrests and detentions and diversion of arrests and detentions of individuals with behavioral health diagnoses; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0469
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {896587/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-1)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 416
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/09/2015 4/10/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Favorable with Amendments {896587/1 Report Adopted 65
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/10/2015 4/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (136-1) 66
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 First Reading Senate Rules 62
Senate 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Second Reading Passed 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 66
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 Returned Passed 72
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 416
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-1401 through 10-1405, 19-303 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM