Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Independent Congressional Redistricting Commission - Mid-Atlantic States Regional Districting Process
Sponsored by
Delegates Reznik, Barkley, Ebersole, Krimm, Lierman, Platt, Waldstreicher, K. Young, Angel, Brooks, Gibson, Hill, Lam, R. Lewis, A. Miller, Moon, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, Tarlau, and Wilkins
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Legislative Services, in the year immediately after the decennial United States Census, to obtain adjusted State census data and provide it, within 30 days of receipt, to the temporary redistricting commission established under the Act; requiring the commission to hold hearings at times likely to maximize public participation and in locations that represent the State's specified diversity; requiring the commission to adopt a congressional districting plan; providing a specified contingency; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0467 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Contingency - on federal, state, or local action
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Legislative and Congressional Districting - Standards and Processes
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {873622/1
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Delegate Flanagan) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {873622/1
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted (88-49)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {223225/1 (Delegate Hill) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (87-51)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Legislative and Congressional Districting - Standards and Processes
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
House 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments {873622/1 64
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Delegate Flanagan) Adopted 64
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments {873622/1 64
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Committee Amendment Adopted (88-49) 64
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 64
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Floor Amendment {223225/1 (Delegate Hill) Adopted 64
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
Text - Third - Independent Congressional Redistricting Commission - Mid-Atlantic States Regional Districting Process
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (87-51) 65
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Referred Rules 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Favorable Adopted 64
Senate 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Second Reading Passed 64
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-6A-01 through 8-6A-09 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM