Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prevailing Wage - Payment for Apprenticeship Programs
Sponsored by
Delegates McCray, Anderson, Barkley, B. Barnes, Branch, Brooks, Clippinger, Davis, Frick, Glenn, Jalisi, Lafferty, Lam, Moon, Morales, Platt, Sydnor, Tarlau, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring contractors and subcontractors under public work contracts subject to the prevailing wage rate law to pay the full cost of specified apprenticeship programs unless the contractor or subcontractor participates in an apprenticeship training program for each classification of workers listed in the prevailing wage determination applicable to the public work contract; requiring specified contractors to keep a list of each apprentice and the apprenticeship program in which the apprentice takes part; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0777
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/05/2015 2/05/2015 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2015 3/18/2015 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-205, 17-220, 17-221 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM