Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Registration Plates for Motorcycles - Individuals with Disabilities
Sponsored by
Delegates Malone, Glenn, Frush, and Norman
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing an individual to possess a specified number of special registration plates for individuals with disabilities for specified motorcycles in addition to the special registration plate and parking placards authorized under specified provisions of law.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0212
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0825 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {270611/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Stone) {533721/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2013 1/25/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/15/2013 2/18/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Favorable with Amendments {270611/1 Report Adopted 30
House 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
House 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 32
Senate 2/22/2013 2/22/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 31
Senate 4/02/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Floor Amendment (Senator Stone) {533721/1 Adopted 60
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 61
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 House Concur - Senate Amendments 64
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 64
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Passed Enrolled 64
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-616, 13-616.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM