Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Traffic Accident or Incident Management (Clear the Road Act of 2019)
Sponsored by
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Transportation)
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Highway Administration, the Maryland Transportation Authority, the Maryland State Police, or a local agency on a highway under its jurisdiction to push or move a disabled vehicle, spilled cargo, or debris off the roadway without the consent of the driver under certain circumstances; prohibiting the pushing or moving of a disabled vehicle, spilled cargo, or debris off the roadway under certain circumstances; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {690813/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/10/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Traffic Accident or Incident Management (Clear the Road Act of 2019)
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Favorable with Amendments {690813/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Traffic Accident or Incident Management (Clear the Road Act of 2019)
House 3/13/2019 3/10/2019 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
(   21-1132 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page