Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property and Casualty Insurance - Filing of Supplementary Rate Information - Inspection
Sponsored by
Delegate Rudolph
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that specified supplementary rate information filed with the Insurance Commissioner is subject to specified protections for trade secret and confidential commercial information under specified circumstances; providing for a specified notice; providing that specified supplementary rate information filed with the Insurance Commissioner may not be open to public inspection for a specified period of time; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0342
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/04/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2014 1/23/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/23/2014 1/23/2014 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/04/2014 2/04/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-101, 11-202, 11-206, 11-307 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM