Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Military Service Credit - Exception
Sponsored by
Delegates Bromwell, Aumann, and Lafferty
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that specified retirees of the Judges' Retirement System may receive additional service credit for military service if the retiree has at least 9 years of service credit earned through employment by a specified date, is unable to accumulate 10 years of service credit for military service due to mandatory retirement at age 70, became a retiree due to mandatory retirement, has a specified amount of service credit at the time of retirement, and purchases a specified amount of service credit after retirement; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2015 3/16/2015 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM