Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Phosphorus Management Tool
Sponsored by
Delegates Lafferty, S. Robinson, B. Barnes, Beidle, Carr, Clippinger, Cullison, Ebersole, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Frush, Gaines, Gilchrist, Gutierrez, Hammen, Haynes, Healey, Hettleman, Hill, Hixson, Holmes, Jones, Kaiser, Korman, Lam, Lierman, Luedtke, McIntosh, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Morhaim, Platt, Proctor, Reznik, B. Robinson, Rosenberg, Smith, Tarlau, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Incorporating by reference specified nutrient management plan requirements in the Maryland Nutrient Management Manual of the Department of Agriculture and any supplements to the Manual; establishing specified content and criteria for a nutrient management plan developed for an agricultural operation; providing that a specified agricultural certification does not prevent the application or enforcement of specified provisions of law; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0257
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/06/2015 2/06/2015 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/31/2015 4/01/2015 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-1006, 8-801, 8-808, 8-808.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM