Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Unattended Child Under the Age of Three
Sponsored by
Delegate Glenn
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person who is charged with the care of a child under the age of 3 years from allowing the child to be locked or confined in a dwelling, a building, an enclosure, or a motor vehicle out of sight unless the person charged with care provides a reliable person at least 15 years old to remain with the child to protect the child; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Emergency Bill
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1480 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/17/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2014 1/23/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/23/2014 1/23/2014 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2014 2/17/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-801 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM