Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Information Act - Suits Filed by Custodians - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegates A. Miller, Ali, Angel, Frush, C. Howard, Jalisi, Korman, Lam, Moon, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting a custodian that receives a request from a person wishing to inspect a public record from filing suit under the Public Information Act against the requesting person.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0167
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Information Act - Suits Filed by Custodians - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2018
Legislative Date
2/13/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Information Act - Suits Filed by Custodians - Prohibition
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 2/13/2018 2/13/2018 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-1A-10, 4-404 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM