Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Inmates - Life Imprisonment - Parole Approval
Sponsored by
Delegates Carter, Holmes, Rosenberg, Anderson, Glenn, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that, if eligible for parole, an eligible person or inmate who is serving a sentence of life imprisonment based on a conviction for felony murder involving circumstances in which the eligible person or inmate was not a principal in the first degree to the crime or based on the person's conviction of an act committed while a minor may be paroled without the approval of the Governor; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0953
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2014 1/23/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/23/2014 1/23/2014 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/30/2014 1/30/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/15/2014 3/15/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-305, 7-301 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM