Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Law Enforcement, Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel (Hometown Heroes Act)
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Adams, Afzali, Anderton, Arentz, Aumann, Buckel, Carozza, Cassilly, Ciliberti, Clark, Cluster, Folden, Ghrist, Grammer, Hornberger, S. Howard, Jacobs, Kipke, Kittleman, Krebs, Long, Malone, Mautz, McComas, McConkey, McKay, McMillan, Metzgar, Miele, Otto, Parrott, Reilly, Rey, Rose, Saab, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Szeliga, Vogt, West, B. Wilson, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the amount of a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for specified qualifying volunteer fire, rescue, and emergency medical services members; providing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax under specified circumstances for a specified amount of retirement income attributable to a resident's employment as a law enforcement officer or the individual's service as fire, rescue, or emergency services personnel; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0322
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2017
Legislative Date
1/31/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2017
Legislative Date
1/31/2017
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2017
Legislative Date
1/31/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2017
Legislative Date
1/31/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Law Enforcement, Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel (Hometown Heroes Act)
House 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/31/2017 1/31/2017 Hearing canceled
House 1/31/2017 1/31/2017 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/31/2017 1/31/2017 Hearing canceled
House 1/31/2017 1/31/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-208, 10-209 )
Last Updated: 1/23/2020 7:39 PM