Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Beginning of School Year - After Labor Day
Sponsored by
Delegates Healey, D. Barnes, Beidle, Beitzel, Carozza, Chang, Fennell, Frush, Gaines, Ghrist, Glass, Glenn, Haynes, Long, Miele, Otto, Parrott, Sophocleus, Walker, and A. Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting public schools and publicly funded prekindergarten programs from opening for pupil attendance prior to the day after Labor Day.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0455
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/09/2015
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/09/2015 2/09/2015 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM