Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Department of Education - Employment Categories and Practices
Sponsored by
Delegates Jones, Ebersole, Haynes, Hettleman, Lierman, Luedtke, Reznik, Solomon, Valentino-Smith, P. Young, and Jackson
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 645
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the employment categories of certain employees of the State Department of Education; requiring that all positions in the Department be appointed positions in the professional service and skilled service as well as the executive service and management service, subject to a certain exception; repealing the authority for special appointment positions; requiring the Department to determine which employment classifications at the Department would be described as being skilled service or professional service; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0643 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Department of Education - Employment Categories and Practices
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {934461/1 Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Department of Education - Employment Categories and Practices
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-42)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-14)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 645
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - State Department of Education - Employment Categories and Practices
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Department of Education - Employment Categories and Practices
House 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Favorable with Amendments {934461/1 Adopted 31
House 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31
Text - Third - State Department of Education - Employment Categories and Practices
House 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (99-42) 33
Senate 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Referred Finance 33
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (33-14) 56
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 645
Text - Chapter - State Department of Education - Employment Categories and Practices
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-104, 2-105 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM