Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Wellness Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Krebs, Cardin, Afzali, Aumann, Bromwell, Cluster, Costa, Cullison, Elliott, George, Howard, Hubbard, A. Kelly, Kipke, McComas, McDonough, W. Miller, Morhaim, Murphy, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Reznik, and Tarrant
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Budget and Management to include a specified wellness program in the State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program; establishing requirements for the wellness program; requiring the Secretary of Budget and Management to submit reports on implementation to the Governor and specified legislative committees on two specified dates, the latter being on or before February 1, 2016; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0224
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0638 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations and Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {434464/1
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate DeBoy) Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {434464/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2013 1/25/2013 First Reading Appropriations and Health and Government Operations
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations and Health and Government Operations)
House 2/22/2013 2/25/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Favorable with Amendments {434464/1 35
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Special Order until later today (Delegate DeBoy) Adopted 35
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Favorable with Amendments {434464/1 Report Adopted 35
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
House 2/28/2013 2/28/2013 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 37
Senate 2/28/2013 2/28/2013 First Reading Finance 35
Senate 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2013 4/02/2013 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM