Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Northeastern Maryland Higher Education Advisory Board - Revisions
Sponsored by
Delegates Rudolph and James
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 597
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the membership of the Northeastern Maryland Higher Education Advisory Board; repealing a provision that requires the Board to ensure that the academic programs and policies of the University Center and sites are in compliance with the policies of the Maryland Higher Education Commission; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/11/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/11/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (121-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 597
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2014 1/23/2014 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/23/2014 1/23/2014 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/07/2014 2/10/2014 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 2/11/2014 2/11/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 25
House 2/11/2014 2/11/2014 Second Reading Passed 25
House 2/13/2014 2/13/2014 Third Reading Passed (121-0) 27
Senate 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 26
Senate 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/24/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/26/2014 3/19/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 53
Senate 3/26/2014 3/19/2014 Second Reading Passed 53
Senate 3/27/2014 3/20/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 54
House 3/27/2014 3/22/2014 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 597
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   24-901, 24-903, 24-904 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM