Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Reorganization
Sponsored by
Delegate Bohanan
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the membership of the Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland; requiring Council members to serve at the pleasure of the individuals or the board that appointed the members; providing for the term of office for the county commissioner position on the Council; requiring the responsibility for appointing the county commissioner position to alternate among the Board of County Commissioners of Calvert County, Charles County, and St. Mary's County; and requiring the Council to elect a chair from among its private sector members.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2014 1/23/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/27/2014 1/27/2014 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-601, 13-602, 13-603, 13-604 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM