Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
More Jobs for Marylanders Act of 2017
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Adams, Afzali, Anderton, Arentz, Aumann, Beitzel, Buckel, Carozza, Cassilly, Ciliberti, Clark, Cluster, Flanagan, Folden, Ghrist, Grammer, Hornberger, S. Howard, Jacobs, Kipke, Kittleman, Krebs, Long, Malone, Mautz, McComas, McConkey, McKay, Metzgar, Miele, Morgan, Otto, Reilly, Rey, Rose, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Szeliga, Vogt, West, and B. Wilson
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the More Jobs for Marylanders Program within the Department of Commerce to provide specified manufacturing business entities tax credits and benefits for up to 10 consecutive benefit years; establishing the Workforce Development Sequence Scholarship for specified students enrolled in a public community college in the State; establishing the More Jobs for Marylanders Tax Credit Reserve Fund; authorizing specified manufacturing businesses to claim a refund for the sales and use tax imposed under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0317
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - More Jobs for Marylanders Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {865365/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {593221/1 (Delegate Buckel) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - More Jobs for Marylanders Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - More Jobs for Marylanders Act of 2017
House 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments {865365/1 Adopted 64
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Floor Amendment {593221/1 (Delegate Buckel) Adopted 64
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
Text - Third - More Jobs for Marylanders Act of 2017
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 65
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Referred Rules 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 6-801 through 6-810 )
(   18-101, 18-3301 through 18-3304 )
(   10-210.1, 10-741, 11-411, 1-303 )
Last Updated: 1/23/2020 7:39 PM