Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Death or Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Subsequent Offenders - Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegates Valentino-Smith, Folden, McComas, B. Wilson, and C. Wilson
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing subsequent offender penalties for specified offenses that result in the death or life-threatening injury to another as the result of a specified person driving, operating, or controlling a vehicle or vessel; and providing that specified offenses committed in another state or federal jurisdiction are to be considered for the application of specified subsequent offender penalties.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/06/2015 2/06/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:15 p.m.
House 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 49
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 Second Reading Passed 49
House 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 50
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47A
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-209, 2-210, 2-503 through 2-506, 3-211 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM