Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Consent Orders - Shielding
Sponsored by
Delegates Simmons, Dumais, Carter, Anderson, Arora, Conaway, Glass, K. Kelly, McComas, McDermott, Rosenberg, Smigiel, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vallario, Vitale, Waldstreicher, and Costa
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 227
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a petitioner to file a written request to shield court records relating to a peace order or protective order proceeding; authorizing the court to order the shielding of all court records relating to a peace order or protective order proceeding if the respondent consented to the entry of the peace order or protective order; requiring the court to balance specified considerations in determining whether to shield court records relating to a peace order or protective order proceeding; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {362517/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (106-29)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {558078/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (102-34)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 227
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2014 1/23/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/23/2014 1/23/2014 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/13/2014 2/13/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/13/2014 2/13/2014 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2014 3/13/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable with Amendments {362517/1 Report Adopted 46
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Third Reading Passed (106-29) 47
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47
Senate 3/26/2014 3/26/2014 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable with Amendments {558078/1 Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 62
House 4/07/2014 4/02/2014 House Concur - Senate Amendments 69
House 4/07/2014 4/02/2014 Third Reading Passed (102-34) 69
House 4/07/2014 4/02/2014 Passed Enrolled 69
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 227
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-512 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM