Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Bail Data Analysis
Sponsored by
Delegates Carter, Atterbeary, Dumais, McComas, Moon, Morales, Pena-Melnyk, and Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Statistical Analysis Center, in consultation with the Administrative Office of the Courts, to develop a procedure and methodology for the compilation and analysis of specified data and the preparation of a specified report and recommendations; and requiring the Maryland Statistical Analysis Center to compile and analyze specified data and to submit a report of its findings and recommendations to the Governor and General Assembly on or before December 31, 2015.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/06/2015 2/06/2015 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2015 3/18/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM