Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System (Carl Henn's Law)
Sponsored by
Delegates Krebs and Jackson (By Request - Commission to Advance Next Generation 9-1-1 Across Maryland), and Delegates Acevero, Anderton, Arentz, Arikan, Atterbeary, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Barron, Bartlett, Barve, Beitzel, Boyce, Branch, Buckel, Carey, Cassilly, Chang, Charkoudian, Charles, Chisholm, Clark, Corderman, Cox, Crosby, D.M. Davis, Dumais, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Ghrist, Gilchrist, Harrison, Haynes, Hettleman, Hill, Hornberger, Howard, Ivey, Kelly, Kerr, Kittleman, Korman, Krimm, Lehman, Lierman, Long, Luedtke, Malone, Mautz, McComas, McKay, Palakovich Carr, Parrott, Patterson, Proctor, Qi, Queen, Reilly, Rose, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Shoemaker, Smith, Solomon, Szeliga, Turner, Valderrama, Walker, R. Watson, Wells, Wilson, P. Young, Adams, Bagnall, Carr, Cullison, Johnson, Kipke, R. Lewis, Metzgar, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Rosenberg, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 301
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Emergency Number Systems Board to establish certain minimum standards for records retention guidelines for 9-1-1 audio, video, text messages, and data; requiring the Board to establish minimum standards for certain 9-1-1 systems that ensure access for individuals with disabilities; altering the purposes of the 9-1-1 Trust Fund beginning on January 1, 2020; authorizing the use of money collected from a certain 9-1-1 fee to pay costs associated with maintenance, operations, and programs approved by the Board; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0339
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System (Carl Henn's Law)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {536182/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System (Carl Henn's Law)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {153227/1 (Senator Reilly) Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-5)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System (Carl Henn's Law)
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 301
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System (Carl Henn's Law)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System (Carl Henn's Law)
House 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing canceled
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {536182/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System (Carl Henn's Law)
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Finance 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Floor Amendment {153227/1 (Senator Reilly) Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (42-5) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System (Carl Henn's Law)
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 301
Text - Chapter - Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System (Carl Henn's Law)
(   1-301, 1-303, 1-304, 1-306, 1-307, 1-308, 1-309, 1-309.1, 1-310, 1-311, 1-312, 1-315 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page