Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Student Debt Relief Act of 2017
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Adams, Afzali, Anderton, Arentz, Aumann, Beitzel, Buckel, Carozza, Cassilly, Ciliberti, Clark, Flanagan, Folden, Ghrist, Hornberger, S. Howard, Jacobs, Kipke, Kittleman, Krebs, Long, Malone, McComas, McConkey, McKay, Metzgar, Miele, Otto, Parrott, Reilly, Rose, Saab, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Szeliga, Vogt, West, B. Wilson, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a subtraction modification under the State income tax for the amount of interest paid by a qualified taxpayer on qualified student loans; requiring the Comptroller to adopt specified regulations; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0320
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Student Debt Relief Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Student Debt Relief Act of 2017
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-208 )
Last Updated: 1/23/2020 7:39 PM