Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Military Department - Powers of the Adjutant General - Summary Courts-Martial
Sponsored by
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee (By Request - Departmental - Military)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 112
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Adjutant General to adopt rules and regulations to govern, discipline, and establish criteria for the performance of duties of the organized militia of the State; exempting the rules and regulations from the requirements of the Administrative Procedure Act; altering the procedures for and penalties that may be imposed by courts-martial for the organized militia; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2013
Legislative Date
1/28/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Special Order until 2/21 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {773429/1 Adopted
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
34B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2013
Legislative Date
4/09/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 112
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2013 1/28/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/18/2013 2/19/2013 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 31
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Special Order until 2/21 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted 31
House 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {773429/1 Adopted 32
House 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 32
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 35
Senate 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 34B
Senate 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/29/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/09/2013 4/09/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 112
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-302, 13-808, 13-808.1, 13-812 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM