Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Sales of Nonbiodegradable Cigarettes - Prohibited
Sponsored by
Delegates Cardin, Arora, Burns, Nathan-Pulliam, B. Robinson, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from offering for sale or selling a cigarette in the State unless the cigarette, including the filter, is biodegradable; establishing that a person that violates the Act is subject to a civil penalty not exceeding $200 for each package of cigarettes sold or offered for sale; authorizing the Attorney General to bring an action to enjoin an act in violation of the Act and to recover specified civil penalties; and providing for a delayed effective date.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/28/2014
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/11/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2014 1/24/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/28/2014 1/28/2014 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/10/2014 2/11/2014 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-1501 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM