Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Energy for Homeowners Association
Sponsored by
Delegates Turner, Barve, Brooks, Ebersole, Hill, Hixson, Jalisi, Lam, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, and Sophocleus
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting from the sales and use tax sales of electricity, steam, or artificial or natural gas to a homeowners association for use in property owned or maintained by the homeowners association; and requiring the Comptroller, on or before October 1, 2016, to provide specified information on the Comptroller's Web site.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0018
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2016 1/29/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM