Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Implementation of the Common Core State Standards - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegates Long, Afzali, Aumann, Cluster, Folden, Ghrist, Glass, Grammer, Hornberger, S. Howard, Impallaria, Jacobs, Kittleman, Krebs, McComas, McKay, Metzgar, W. Miller, Morgan, O'Donnell, Parrott, Reilly, Saab, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Szeliga, Vitale, and Vogt
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the State Board of Education and specified county boards of education from establishing specified educational policies, curriculum, and guidelines that include or are based on the Common Core State Standards; prohibiting the State Board from entering into any agreements or joining any organizations that give control over educational matters to any entity other than the State; requiring the State Board to take specified steps to rescind the State Board's adoption of the Common Core State Standards; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0076 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/09/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2015 2/09/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-205.1, 4-111.4, 7-203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM