Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commission to Study Legislative and Congressional Districting
Sponsored by
Delegates Hill, Krimm, Ebersole, Lam, Sample-Hughes, and Valentino-Smith
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Commission to Study Legislative and Congressional Districting; providing that the Commission include two members of the Senate appointed by the President of the Senate, one of whom will be a cochair, and two members of the House of Delegates appointed by the Speaker of the House, one of whom will be a cochair of the Commission, and other specified members; requiring the Commission to study and report its recommendations regarding legislative and congressional districting by December 31, 2016; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2016 1/29/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/29 at 3:00 p.m.
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM