Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Charles County - Warrant Intercept Program
Sponsored by
Charles County Delegation
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the requirement for the Comptroller to withhold Maryland income tax refunds of specified individuals with outstanding warrants to include residents of Charles County or individuals who have outstanding warrants from Charles County; making nonsubstantive changes to specified termination provisions; making conforming changes; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016, October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2016 1/29/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/29/2016 1/29/2016 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-935, 13-936, 13-937 through 13-940 )
(   2012, 2013 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM