Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Sponsored by
Delegates Moon, Atterbeary, Carr, Dumais, Morhaim, Queen, Sanchez, and Sydnor
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Human Resources to take specified actions in the best interests of the child when serving as a representative payee or fiduciary for specified federal benefits for a child in the Department's custody; requiring the Department to provide immediate notification to the child, through the child's attorney, of specified actions taken with respect to specified benefits for the child; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0442
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
House 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-527.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM