Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Aquaculture Leases - Consideration of User Conflicts
Sponsored by
Delegates Jacobs, Adams, Anderton, Arentz, Ghrist, Hornberger, S. Howard, Impallaria, Mautz, and Otto
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Natural Resources to consider potential user conflicts, including navigation, recreation, and commercial fishing, in determining the location of submerged land aquaculture leases in the Chesapeake Bay and water column aquaculture leases in the waters of the State; requiring the Department to mitigate and minimize the effects of the proposed location of specified aquaculture leasing areas on other users if the Department determines that conflicts exist; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0709
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/09/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2015 2/09/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2015 3/19/2015 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-11A-05, 4-11A-06, 4-11A-07, 4-11A-08 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM