Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commission on Rental Housing Stabilization
Sponsored by
Delegates M. Washington, Cullison, Fennell, Glenn, Lafferty, Lierman, McCray, Morales, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, and Tarlau
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Commission on Rental Housing Stabilization; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Commission; prohibiting a member of the Commission from receiving specified compensation; requiring the Commission to investigate strategies for stabilizing rental housing conditions in the State, evaluate the experiences of different groups of tenants in the State, including senior citizens, military personnel, minorities, disabled persons, families, and tenants from different economic backgrounds; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0480
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/09/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/09/2015
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2015 2/09/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/09/2015 2/09/2015 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 3/18/2015 3/19/2015 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM