Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commonsense Spending Act of 2017
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration)
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that, beginning in fiscal year 2019, any appropriation that is mandated by law is required to have its mandated level of spending increased by the lesser of the amount of the existing formula or 1% less than the amount of General Fund revenue growth in a specified report submitted by the Board of Revenue Estimates; providing that the General Assembly may not enact specified legislation that creates a specified mandated level of funding except under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0303
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Commonsense Spending Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Commonsense Spending Act of 2017
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page