Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Secure Choice Retirement Savings Program and Trust
Sponsored by
Delegates Frick, Rosenberg, Stein, Barron, Barve, Bromwell, Carr, Clippinger, Cullison, Ebersole, Gilchrist, Haynes, Healey, Hixson, Korman, Lam, Lierman, Luedtke, McCray, Moon, Morales, Morhaim, Pendergrass, Platt, Reznik, Smith, Tarlau, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Secure Choice Retirement Savings Program for eligible private sector employees; establishing the Maryland Secure Choice Retirement Savings Trust; establishing the Maryland Secure Choice Retirement Savings Board to implement, maintain, and administer the Program and the Trust; requiring eligible employers to offer the Program and requiring eligible employees to participate in the Program unless written notice to opt out is provided to the employer; authorizing the Comptroller to enforce employer compliance; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0312
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/09/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2015 2/09/2015 First Reading Economic Matters and Appropriations
House 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-101 through 12-601 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM